+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0001
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0001
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0001
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0001
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
- Placed on General File
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
- Placed on General File
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On December 8, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (4)
February 7, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 1, 2017: S01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
January 17, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 13, 2017: H01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Joint Judiciary Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor