+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H03 Recommended Do Pass
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H03
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor