+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0076
- Assigned Chapter Number 126
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0076
- H Speaker Signed HEA No. 0076
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- S President Signed HEA No. 0076
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- :Rerefer to H06 - Travel
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2021: S 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
March 30, 2021: S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
March 19, 2021: H 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 60
March 9, 2021: H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Sherwood
Type:
Primary Sponsor