+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0064
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0064
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0064
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0064
- Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Placed on General File
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 2017: Concur
- Yeas: 60
February 23, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 13, 2017: S10 - Labor
- Yeas: 5
January 30, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 60
January 24, 2017: H10 - Labor
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor