+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Failed Motion to Consider in COW on Same Day
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Did Not Consider in COW
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H07 Recommended Do Pass
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned