+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0062
On March 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0062
On March 7, 2008 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0062
On March 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0062
- Adopted HB0155JC01
On March 7, 2008 in the House:
- Adopted HB0155JC01
On March 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
- Did Not Concur
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Received for Concurrence
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- S02 Recommended Do Pass
- Placed on General File
- Passed CoW
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to S02
- Placed on General File
- S10 Recommended Do Pass
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S10
- Received for Introduction
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Rereferred to H02
- H10 Recommended Do Pass
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H10
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned