+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
- H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor 58-1-1-0-0
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 22, 2018: H02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 20, 2018: H10 - Labor
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 15, 2018: Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor 58-1-1-0-0
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor