+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- H COW:H Did not consider for COW
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- H COW:Failed 23-23-14-0-0
- H COW:Rescind original vote pursuant to HR 11-5 Passed 21-23-16
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 19, 2021: H COW:Failed 23-23-14-0-0
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 23
March 19, 2021: H COW:Rescind original vote pursuant to HR 11-5 Passed 21-23-16
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 23
March 5, 2021: H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Stith
Type:
Primary Sponsor