+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0096
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0096
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0096
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0096
- Concur:Passed 53-7-0-0-0
- Received for Concurrence
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0
- Placed on General File
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 50-7-3-0-0
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2017: Concur
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 7
February 28, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
February 27, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 21
February 15, 2017: S01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 3
January 23, 2017: H09 - Minerals
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor