+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0039
- Assigned Chapter Number 51
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed HEA No. 0039
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- S President Signed HEA No. 0039
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 21-8-1-0-0
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0039
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 43-17-0-0-0
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 26, 2021: S 3rd Reading:Passed 21-8-1-0-0
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
March 18, 2021: S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 4
March 8, 2021: H 3rd Reading:Passed 43-17-0-0-0
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 17
March 3, 2021: H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor