+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0019
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0019
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0019
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0019
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed COW
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S09 Recommended Do Pass
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S09
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed COW
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H09 Recommended Do Pass
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned