+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0123
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0123
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0123
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0123
- Adopts HB0144JC01 and Recedes from Nonconcurrence
- Adopted HB0144JC01
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
- Did Not Concur
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Concurrence
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S02
- Received for Introduction
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Laid Back Pursuant to HR 9-3 C
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 16, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H02
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 12, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned