+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- No report prior to CoW Cutoff
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
- H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (3)
January 31, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 60
January 25, 2017: H02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 7
January 20, 2017: H09 - Minerals
- Yeas: 9