+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0049
- Assigned Chapter Number 96
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- S President Signed HEA No. 0049
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0049
- H Speaker Signed HEA No. 0049
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2021: S 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 2
March 25, 2021: S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
March 17, 2021: H 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 3
March 4, 2021: H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Brown
Type:
Primary Sponsor