+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Motion to Do Pass Failed
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 12, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor