+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- H Did Not Consider in CoW
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
January 28, 2019: H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Burkhart
Type:
Primary Sponsor