+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0107
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0107
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0107
- Concur:Passed 47-13-0-0-0
- Concur:Rescind original vote pursuant to Mason's §§ 480 to 483 40-20-0-0-0
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
- Concur:Failed 4-56-0-0-0
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 47-13-0-0-0
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (10)
+ − Votes (12)
March 1, 2017: Concur
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 20
March 1, 2017: Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 13
February 28, 2017: Concur
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 56
February 27, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 10
February 24, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
February 24, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 18
February 24, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 18
February 24, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 16
February 23, 2017: COW
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 1
February 15, 2017: S01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
February 1, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 13
January 24, 2017: H01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor