+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Failed 3rd 15-15; Failed Reconsideration
- Failed 3rd Reading
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S06 Recommended Do Pass
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S06
- Received for Introduction
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H06 Recommended Do Pass
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H06
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 12, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor