+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Failed 13-17-0-0-0
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 40-19-1-0-0
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 2017: COW
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 17
February 15, 2017: S01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
February 1, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 1
January 24, 2017: H01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor