+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0039
- Assigned Chapter Number 81
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed HEA No. 0039
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- S President Signed HEA No. 0039
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- H Concur:Passed 55-3-2-0-0
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0039
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- H Received for Concurrence
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Placed on General File
- S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
- H Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 2019: H Concur:Passed 55-3-2-0-0
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 3
February 14, 2019: S 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
February 8, 2019: S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
January 31, 2019: H 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
January 18, 2019: H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Harshman
Type:
Primary Sponsor