+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0064
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number 122
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0064
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0064
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0064
- Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Received for Concurrence
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Placed on General File
- COW:Passed
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 60-0-0-0-0
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
March 10, 2018: Concur
- Yeas: 60
March 9, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
March 7, 2018: S05 - Agriculture
- Yeas: 5
March 7, 2018: COW
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 27, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 20, 2018: H02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 7
February 14, 2018: Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 60-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 60
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor