+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
- Placed on General File
- Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 4, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2015: Appropriations
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 28, 2015: Minerals
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor