+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0023
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0023
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0023
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0023
- 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
- Placed on General File
- S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
- Placed on General File
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On December 7, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (4)
February 13, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 9, 2017: S02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 5
January 20, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 18, 2017: H02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor