+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0043
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0043
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0043
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0043
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 27-1-2-0-0
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 45-15-0-0-0
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (4)
February 21, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 9, 2017: S08 - Transportation
- Yeas: 5
February 1, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 15
January 27, 2017: H08 - Transportation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor