+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- S01 Motion to Do Pass Failed Returned in Accordance with SR 5-4
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01
- Received for Introduction
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Passed COW
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 Recommended Do Pass
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned