+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Did Not Consider in COW
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned