+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- H01 - Judiciary:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 55-4-1-0-0
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On December 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 15, 2018: H02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 7
February 14, 2018: H01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
February 12, 2018: Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 55-4-1-0-0
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Joint Judiciary Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor