+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0028
- Assigned Chapter Number 42
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0028
- H Speaker Signed HEA No. 0028
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- S President Signed HEA No. 0028
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 55-5-0-0-0
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 25, 2021: S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 30
March 12, 2021: S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
March 8, 2021: H 3rd Reading:Passed 55-5-0-0-0
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 5
March 2, 2021: H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Duncan
Type:
Primary Sponsor