+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number Chapter No. 55 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0032
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0032
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0032
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0032
- 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- COW Passed
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- COW Passed
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 20, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 17, 2015: Revenue
- Yeas: 5
February 3, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 60
January 28, 2015: Revenue
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor