+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0025
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0025
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0025
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0025
- Did Concur
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- S04 Recommended Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S04
- Received for Introduction
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H04 Recommended Do Pass
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H04
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned