+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0003
- Assigned Chapter Number 2
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0003
- H Speaker Signed HEA No. 0003
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- S President Signed HEA No. 0003
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
- S COW:Passed
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 46-13-1-0-0
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On December 10, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2020: S 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 29
February 26, 2020: S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
February 17, 2020: H 3rd Reading:Passed 47-11-2-0-0
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 11
February 12, 2020: H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 9
February 11, 2020: H Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 46-13-1-0-0
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 13
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor