+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Failed 5-22-3-0-0
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed 11-10-9-0-0
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 34-24-2-0-0
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
- H Received for Introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2019: S 3rd Reading:Failed 5-22-3-0-0
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 22
February 20, 2019: S COW:Passed 11-10-9-0-0
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 10
February 15, 2019: S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
January 29, 2019: H 3rd Reading:Passed 34-24-2-0-0
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 24
January 23, 2019: H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Larsen
Type:
Primary Sponsor