+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0049
- Assigned Chapter Number
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0049
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0049
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0049
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S09 Recommended Do Pass
- Rereferred to S02
- S02 Recommended Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S09
- Received for Introduction
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 19, 2010 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Rereferred to H03
- Introduced and Referred to H09
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor