+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Did Not Consider in COW
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 7, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor