+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0022
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0022
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0022
- Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Received for Concurrence
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 60-0-0-0-0
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 6, 2018: Concur
- Yeas: 60
March 5, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 28, 2018: S09 - Minerals
- Yeas: 5
February 20, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 60
February 15, 2018: H07 - Corporations
- Yeas: 9
February 14, 2018: Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 60-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 60
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor