+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0003
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0003
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0003
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0003
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- S06 Recommended Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S06
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H06 Recommended Do Pass
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H06
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor