+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 21103301D-EH1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1985EH1
- Committee on Appropriations amendments agreed to
- Committee on Labor and Commerce substitute agreed to 21103301D-H1
- Read second time
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 21103301D-H1
- Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101723D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (6)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2021: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
January 29, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2021: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2021: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor