+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0639)
On March 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 639 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 1997 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB906ER)
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- Amendment by Ms. Cunningham agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (99-Y 1-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 12, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 1-N)
On February 6, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 4
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Presented & ordered printed 972368817
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
February 11, 1997: Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 1-N)
January 28, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
January 24, 1997: Reported from R. & S. S. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor