+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 15
On April 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 4-15-2022
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Concurred in
- Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to committee on Rules
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Adopted by unanimous rising vote
- Read
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
- Introduced by Senators Cowles, Carpenter, Darling and Nass; cosponsored by Representatives Steineke, Cabral-Guevara, Drake, Hesselbein, Hintz, Magnafici, Milroy, Moses, Ohnstad, Penterman, Sinicki, Snodgrass, Spiros, Steffen, Subeck and Vruwink
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor