+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to committee on Rules
On January 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Adopted
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
- Introduced by Senators Feyen, Vukmir, Darling and Moulton; cosponsored by Representative VanderMeer