+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Representative Kahl added as a cosponsor
- Concurred in
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 5-13-2015 by Committee on Rules
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to committee on Rules
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Adopted
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 4-21-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
- Introduced by Senators Miller, Shilling, Harsdorf, Hansen, Vinehout, Erpenbach, Lassa, Risser, Wirch, Ringhand, Harris Dodd, Olsen, L. Taylor and Bewley; cosponsored by Representatives Hebl, Nerison, Allen, Brostoff, Danou, Hesselbein, Hintz, Horlacher, Jorgensen, Knudson, Milroy, Murtha, Ohnstad, Pope, Sargent, Sinicki, Subeck and Zamarripa
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor