+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Concurred in
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-18-2016 by Committee on Rules
On January 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to committee on Rules
On January 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Senator Hansen added as a coauthor
- Adopted
- Senator Miller added as a coauthor
- Senator Bewley added as a coauthor
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 1-20-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On December 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
- Introduced by Senators L. Taylor, Carpenter, Harris Dodd, Lasee, Olsen, Ringhand and Risser; cosponsored by Representatives Ballweg, Pope, Brostoff, Goyke, Jacque, Johnson, Jorgensen, Kahl, Kolste, Mason, Milroy, Ohnstad, A. Ott, Petryk, Rohrkaste, Sinicki, Subeck and Berceau
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor