+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to committee on Rules
On March 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Adopted by unanimous rising vote
- Bewley, Cowles, Larson, LeMahieu, Petrowski, Schachtner and Testin of the Senate added as coauthors
- Read
- Rules suspended and taken up
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On August 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor
- Representative Genrich added as a cosponsor
On August 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
- Introduced by Senators Kapenga, Vukmir, Carpenter, Craig, Darling, Erpenbach, Feyen, Fitzgerald, Hansen, Harsdorf, Johnson, Lasee, Marklein, Miller, Moulton, Nass, Olsen, Ringhand, Risser, Roth, Shilling, Stroebel, L. Taylor, Tiffany, Wanggaard, Wirch and Vinehout; cosponsored by Representatives Kooyenga, Allen, Anderson, August, Ballweg, Berceau, Bowen, Brandtjen, Crowley, Duchow, Edming, Felzkowski, Fields, Gannon, Hesselbein, Hintz, Horlacher, Hutton, Jacque, Jagler, Katsma, Kitchens, Kleefisch, Knodl, Krug, Kuglitsch, Loudenbeck, Mason, Murphy, Mursau, Neylon, Ott, Pope, Ripp, Rodriguez, Rohrkaste, Sanfelippo, Sargent, Schraa, Shankland, Sinicki, Skowronski, Spiros, Spreitzer, Steffen, Steineke, Subeck, Swearingen, Tauchen, Thiesfeldt, Tranel, VanderMeer, Vorpagel, Vruwink, Wachs, Weatherston, Wichgers and Zepnick
+ − Sponsors (85)
Type:
Primary Sponsor