+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
- Representative Zamarripa added as a cosponsor
On October 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On October 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Concurred in
- Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up
- Read and referred to committee on Rules
On October 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Ringhand added as a coauthor
- Adopted
- Ordered immediately messaged
On October 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On October 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 10-20-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On October 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Vinehout added as a coauthor
On October 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Representative Petryk added as a cosponsor
On October 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Representative Riemer added as a cosponsor
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
- Introduced by Senators Wirch, Petrowski, Lassa, C. Larson, Carpenter, L. Taylor, Lasee, Cowles, Lazich and Bewley; cosponsored by Representatives Skowronski, Mason, Kerkman, Murphy, Goyke, Ohnstad, Sinicki, Zepnick, Danou, Jorgensen and Spreitzer
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor