+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On December 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report adoption recommended by Committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2
On December 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On November 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On September 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection
- Introduced by Senators Marklein, Kapenga, Gudex, Lasee, LeMahieu, Nass, Stroebel and Tiffany; cosponsored by Representatives Kooyenga, August, Macco, Bernier, Craig, Horlacher, Hutton, Jarchow, Knudson, Kremer, T. Larson, Quinn, Rohrkaste, Allen and Murphy
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor