+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On September 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On September 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Concurred in
On September 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 9-24-2015 by Committee on Rules
On September 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to committee on Rules
On September 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Senator L. Taylor added as a coauthor
- Adopted
On September 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 9-16-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On September 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
- Introduced by Senators Gudex, LeMahieu, Vukmir, Lasee, Marklein, Erpenbach, Miller, Stroebel, Olsen, Nass, Vinehout, Darling, Risser and Lazich; cosponsored by Representatives Vorpagel, Thiesfeldt, Spiros, Kerkman, Jagler, Ripp, Jarchow, Ballweg, Goyke, Ohnstad, Hutton, Hintz, A. Ott, E. Brooks, Mursau, Krug, Subeck, Barca, Katsma, Knodl, Murtha, Murphy and Sinicki
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor