+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Published 6-16-2022. Enrolled Joint Resolution 13
On April 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 4-15-2022
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On February 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Concurred in, Ayes 60, Noes 35, Paired 4
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On February 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 9:38 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Rules suspended
- Adopted, Ayes 21, Noes 12
On January 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report adoption recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Executive action taken
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Representative Murphy added as a cosponsor
On December 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism
- Introduced by Senators Roth, Bradley, Nass, Felzkowski, Jacque, Jagler, Stroebel and Ballweg; cosponsored by Representatives Steineke, August, Armstrong, Born, Brooks, Cabral-Guevara, Dallman, Dittrich, Duchow, Edming, Gundrum, Katsma, Kuglitsch, Kurtz, Loudenbeck, Magnafici, Mursau, Petersen, Plumer, Rozar, Sortwell, Spiros, Steffen, Swearingen, Tauchen, Thiesfeldt, Tittl, VanderMeer, Vorpagel, Wichgers, Wittke, Schraa and Neylon
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2022: Concurred in, Paired 4
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 35
January 25, 2022: Adopted
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 11
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor