+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Representative Jarchow withdrawn as a cosponsor
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report adoption as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 3, Noes 2
- Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 4, Noes 1
- Executive action taken
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kapenga
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read and referred to Committee on Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism
- Introduced by Senators Kapenga, Craig, Darling, Harsdorf, Lasee, Marklein, Nass, Olsen, Stroebel, Testin, Tiffany and Vukmir; cosponsored by Representatives Knodl, Bernier, August, Born, E. Brooks, Duchow, Felzkowski, Horlacher, Hutton, Jarchow, Katsma, Kerkman, Kleefisch, Kooyenga, Kremer, Krug, Kuglitsch, Kulp, Macco, Mursau, Neylon, Nygren, Petersen, Petryk, Rodriguez, Rohrkaste, Sanfelippo, Schraa, Skowronski, Snyder, Spiros, Steffen, Steineke, Summerfield, Swearingen, Thiesfeldt, Tittl, Vos, Weatherston and Wichgers
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor