+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 9
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 4-28-2017
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report correctly enrolled
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly concurred in
On March 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor
- Concurred in
- Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up
On March 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read and referred to committee on Rules
- Received from Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Adopted
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 3-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
- Introduced by Senators Cowles, Bewley, Carpenter, Olsen, Petrowski, L. Taylor, Vinehout and Wirch; cosponsored by Representatives Tauchen, Anderson, Crowley, E. Brooks, Mason, Milroy, Murphy, Pope, Sinicki, Thiesfeldt, Tranel, Tusler, Vruwink and Wachs
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor