+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On September 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Representative Zimmerman added as a cosponsor
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report adoption recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection
- Introduced by Senators Stroebel, Bernier, Felzkowski and Nass; cosponsored by Representatives Ramthun, Allen, Dittrich, Edming, Gundrum, James, Knodl, Krug, Magnafici, Moses, Rozar, Schraa, Steffen, Thiesfeldt, Tusler and Tittl
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor